Our officers each possess outstanding records of scientific achievement in the field of optics. The time and effort given by our elected representatives provide a strong foundation for the Optica's future.
As a nonprofit organization, we are committed to safeguarding the trust placed it is by our members and the optics and photonics community as a whole. Our commitment to unsurpassed quality and best practices in governance, accountability, and transparency, exist at all level of our organization. These values are most apparent in the dedication and perseverance of our elected officers.
“I hope to promote efforts to continue the globalization and diversification of the society.“
Officers
Constance J. Chang-Hasnain
Immediate Past President
Berxel Photonics, Chairperson <br> University of California Berkeley, Professor Emerita
Term: 1 January 2022 to 31 December 2022
Board of Directors
Alex Gaeta
Chair, Publications Council
Columbia University, USA
Term: 1 January 2020 to 31 December 2022
Amy Eskilson
Chair, Corporate Engagement Council
Inrad Optics, USA
Term: 1 January 2022 to 31 December 2023
Joyce Poon
Director at Large
Max Planck Institute of Microstructure Physics, Germany
Term: 1 January 2021 to 31 December 2023
Judith Dawes
Director at Large
Macquarie University, Australia
Term: 1 January 2022 to 31 December 2024
Katherine Calabro
Chair, Membership Engagement and Development Council
Synopsys' Optical Solutions Group
Term: 1 January 2022 to 31 December 2023
Min Qiu
Director at Large Appointed
Westlake University, China
Term: 1 January 2022 to 31 December 2024
Polina Bayvel
Director at Large
University College London, UK
Term: 1 January 2020 to 31 December 2022
Steven Cundiff
Chair, Meetings Council
University of Michigan Randall Laboratories, USA
Term: 1 January 2022 to 31 December 2023
Sujatha Ramanujan
Director at Large Appointed
Luminate, USA
Term: 1 January 2022 to 31 December 2022
Ulrike Woggon
Director at Large
Technische Universität Berlin, Germany
Term: 1 January 2021 to 31 December 2023